EP0961934 - PARTICLES WITH POLYALDEHYDE DEXTRAN COATING HAVING REDUCED MATRIX EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DADE BEHRING INC. 1717 Deerfield Road Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Chengrong 214 Cherry Blossom Place Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Helbing, Jörg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Pfeil, Hugo, Dr. Dade Behring Marburg GmbH, Patente und Lizenzen, Postfach 11 49 35001 Marburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98960825.2 | 08.12.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US26055 | Priority number, date | US19970988628 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: US 988628 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930160 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961934 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961934 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/548, G01N33/546, G01N33/553 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/548 (EP,US);
G01N33/5434 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N2446/20 (EP,US);
G01N2446/86 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1999/49] | Title | German: | TEILCHEN MIT POLYALDEHYD-DEXTRAN-ÜBERZUG, DIE VERKLEINERTE MATRIXEFFEKTE AUFWEISEN | [1999/49] | English: | PARTICLES WITH POLYALDEHYDE DEXTRAN COATING HAVING REDUCED MATRIX EFFECTS | [1999/49] | French: | PARTICULES ENROBEES DE DEXTRANE DE POLYALDEHYDE AVEC EFFETS DE MATRICE REDUITS | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4452773 (MOLDAY ROBERT S [CA]) [A] 1-18 * column 8, line 32 - line 68 *; | [A]US4534996 (REMBAUM ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 7 *; | [DA]US4661408 (LAU HON-PENG P [US], et al) [DA] 1-3,6,7,10 * column 6, line 19 - column 8, line 2 *; | [A]US4801504 (BURDICK BRENT A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 6 *; | [A]US4861705 (MARGEL SHLOMO [IL]) [A] 1-18 * example 21; claim 1 *; | [DA]US5151348 (LAU HON-PENG P [US], et al) [DA] 1-3,6,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9409368 (COULTER CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 40 - page 54 *; | [A] - Y MANABE, T TSUBOTA, Y HARUTA, K KATAOKA, M OKAZARI, S HAISA, K NAKAMURA, I KIMURA, "Production of a monoclonal antibody-methotrexate conjugate utilizing dextran T-40 and its biologic activity", JOURNAL OF LABORATORY AND CLINICAL MEDICINE, (198409), vol. 104, pages 445 - 454, XP002100335 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * |