EP1066591 - DATA CARRYING DEVICE AND SYSTEMS FOR USE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chip Application Technologies Limited Level 4, Ballarat House, 68-72 Wentworth Avenue Surry Hills, NSW 2010 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Chip Application Technologies Limited Cabcharge House, Level 5, 152-162 Riley Street East Sydney, NSW 2010 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAC.SMITH, David L. Cabcharge House, Level 5, 152-162 Riley Street East Sydney, NSW 2010 / AU | 02 /
GARTON, Ben Cabcharge House, Level 5, 152-162 Riley Street East Sydney, NSW 2010 / AU | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2001/02] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960868.2 | 04.12.1998 | [2001/02] | WO1998AU01009 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP02740 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: AU PP274098 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952065 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066591 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G07F7/10 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3552 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3576 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/02] | G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGER UND BENUTZUNGSSYSTEME DAFÜR | [2001/02] | English: | DATA CARRYING DEVICE AND SYSTEMS FOR USE THEREWITH | [2001/02] | French: | UNITE SUPPORT DE DONNEES ET TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 05.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/04] | Request for further processing for: | 10.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0292248 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]US4829169 (WATANABE HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]EP0328289 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [A] 1,4-7,11-14 * abstract *; | [AX]EP0354793 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-7,17,19,20,24 * the whole document * [X] 8-10; | [YA]US4930129 (TAKAHIRA KENICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 30 * [A] 4-7,9,10,17,19,20,24; | [A]FR2640783 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [A]EP0565389 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]); | [A]US5452431 (BOURNAS JEAN-PIERRE [FR]); | [A]US5495098 (PAILLES JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1,15,17-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9705582 (KEYCORP LIMITED [AU], et al) [A] 1,17-27 * abstract *; | [A]EP0807907 (DE LA RUE THOMAS & CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,17-27 * abstract *; | [Y] - GUEULLE P, "LES E2PROM SERIE SECURISEES", ELECTRONIQUE RADIO PLANS, SPE, PARIS, FR, (19930701), no. 548, ISSN 1144-5742, pages 23 - 28, XP000377636 [Y] 1-3 * page 26, column 1, paragraph LAST - column 3, paragraph LAST * * page 28, column 1, line 15 - line 28; figures 9,14 * | International search | [X]EP0657851 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]GB2294562 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]WO9706516 (BELLE GATE INVEST BV [NL], et al); | [XP]AU5288198 (KONINKLIJKE KPN NV) |