EP0986743 - METHOD FOR TESTING INSTALLED SHOCK ABSORBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beissbarth GmbH Hanauer Str. 101 80993 München / DE | [2000/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUJEAN, Frank Maxingstrasse 7 D-84453 Mühldorf am Inn / DE | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98961251.0 | 04.12.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998EP07888 | Priority number, date | DE1997154853 | 08.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19754853 | [2000/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930126 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986743 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/04 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G01M17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [2000/12] | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN VON EINGEBAUTEN STOSSDÄMPFERN | [2000/12] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING INSTALLED SHOCK ABSORBERS | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE POUR TESTER DES AMORTISSEURS MONTES | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/01] | 01.08.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4774829 (WESTALL PETER [CA]) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]US4703645 (HUDACSEK ISTVAN [HU], et al) [Y] 2-10 * column 5 - column 7 *; | [YD]DE4439997 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [YD] 2-10 * claims 1-21 *; | [A]EP0650859 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 6 - column 18 *; | [A]DE4333379 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]GB1566710 (DUNLOP LTD) [A] 1 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US5610514 (RAMAKER ANTONIUS E T J [NL]) [A] 1 * column 6 - column 8 * |