EP1059433 - VALVE DEVICE AND VALVE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA, Hisashi, Mitsubishi Denki Eng. K.K. 2-6-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Satoshi, Mitsubishi Denki Eng. K.K. 2-6-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 03 /
MIYOSHI, Sotsuo, Mitsubishi Denki Eng. K.K. 2-6-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 04 /
MIYAKE, Toshihiko, Mitsubishi Denki Eng. K.K. 2-6-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98961614.9 | 25.12.1998 | [2000/50] | WO1998JP05971 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039446 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059433 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059433 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
F02M26/54 (EP,KR,US);
F02M26/66 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/50] | Title | German: | VENTIL UND VENTILSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2000/50] | English: | VALVE DEVICE AND VALVE CONTROL METHOD | [2000/50] | French: | SOUPAPE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE SOUPAPE | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2000 | Translation filed | 22.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 07.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0685640 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 24, line 25 - column 27, line 22 * * column 28, line 22 - column 29, line 27 * * column 31, line 5 - column 33, line 30 *; | [A]EP0810361 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 12, line 47 - column 14, line 45 *; | [A]JPH05168294 ; | [A]JPH10159592 ; | [A]US5503131 (OHUCHI HIROFUMI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 9, line 41 - column 12, line 64 *; | [A]JPH0893573 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931020), vol. 017, no. 578, Database accession no. (E - 1450), & JP05168294 A 19930702 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 13 - page 4, paragraph 19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10159592 A 19980616 (HITACHI CAR ENG CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 8, paragraph 59 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08093573 A 19960409 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH10159592 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH07332168 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENG, et al); | [Y]JPH0783122 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH0893573 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH04276166 (AISAN IND); | [A]JPH04301170 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH0746891 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH08114158 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |