EP0961866 - CLOSED DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF DRILLING FLUIDS AND CUTTINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercur Subsea Products Asa P.O. Box 521 9485 Harstad / NO | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Ole, Dagfinn Rorhusveien 9 N-9411 Harstad / NO | 02 /
KALVENES, Öystein Gimlebakken 25 N-5052 Solheimsviken / NO | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Franks, Barry, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 98961694.1 | 27.11.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998NO00350 | Priority number, date | NO19970005452 | 27.11.1997 Original published format: NO 975452 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928591 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961866 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961866 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21B21/06 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
E21B21/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/49] | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENES SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BOHRSPÜLUNG UND BOHRKLEIN | [1999/49] | English: | CLOSED DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF DRILLING FLUIDS AND CUTTINGS | [1999/49] | French: | SYSTEME FERME DE TRAITEMENT DES BOUES ET DEBRIS DE FORAGE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 09.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2003 | BE | 16.07.2003 | CH | 16.07.2003 | ES | 16.07.2003 | FI | 16.07.2003 | FR | 16.07.2003 | IT | 16.07.2003 | LI | 16.07.2003 | NL | 16.07.2003 | DK | 16.10.2003 | GR | 16.10.2003 | SE | 16.10.2003 | DE | 17.10.2003 | CY | 27.11.2003 | GB | 27.11.2003 | IE | 27.11.2003 | LU | 27.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | PT | 16.12.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
ES | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
FR | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
IE | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
FR | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
IE | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
IE | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
DE | 17.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 16.07.2003 | |
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 16.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4639258 (SCHELLSTEDE HERMAN J [US], et al); | [A]NO170394B (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]); | [A]US5454957 (ROFF JR JOHN W [US]); | [A]US5582727 (FOSTER MIKE L [US]) |