EP1034587 - SELF-TARGETING READER SYSTEM FOR REMOTE IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectra Science Corporation 155 South Main Street, Suite 101 Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLTSOS, William 7 Donna Lane Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98961787.3 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US25168 | Priority number, date | US19970066837P | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 66837 P | US19980197650 | 23.11.1998 Original published format: US 197650 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927623 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034587 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/14, B07C5/00, D06F93/00, B07C5/34 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
B07C5/3412 (EP,US);
B07C5/342 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | H01S3/14, B07C5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/37] | Title | German: | SELBSTAUSRICHTENDES LESESYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIKATION ÜBER GRÖSSERE ENTFERNUNGEN | [2000/37] | English: | SELF-TARGETING READER SYSTEM FOR REMOTE IDENTIFICATION | [2000/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE LECTURE A LOCALISATION AUTOMATIQUE DE CIBLES POUR IDENTIFICATION A DISTANCE | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4036365 (ROSENFELD HOWARD) [A] 1-43* column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 53 *; | [A]US4136778 (WORTMAN JIMMIE J, et al) [A] 1-43 * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 48 * * figures * | International search | [A]US4990322 (POLLOCK CLIFFORD R [US], et al); | [Y]EP0552539 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP]); | [Y]US5443164 (WALSH CASEY P [US], et al); | [Y]US5448582 (LAWANDY NABIL M [US]); | [A]US5629953 (BISHOP STEPHEN G [US], et al) |