EP1029143 - LOCKING DEVICE WITH A KEY-ACTIVATED CYLINDER CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states HUF HÜLSBECK & FÜRST GMBH & CO. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEURDEN, Armin Kirchstrasse 3 D-47929 Grefrath / DE | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Mentzel, Norbert Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 98962312.9 | 02.11.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998EP06924 | Priority number, date | DE1997149329 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19749329 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924685 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029143 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029143 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/04 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
E05B17/0058 (EP,US);
E05B17/04 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T70/7949 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SCHLÜSSELBETÄTIGBAREN ZYLINDERKERN | [2000/34] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE WITH A KEY-ACTIVATED CYLINDER CORE | [2000/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE CENTRALE DE CYLINDRE ACTIONNABLE PAR UNE CLEF | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4410783 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4122414 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4410736 (EWALD WITTE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4408910 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4122414 | DE4410783 |