EP1040408 - WEIGHTLESS BINARY N-TUPLE THRESHOLDING HIERARCHIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Douglas Beverley Stevenson British A.M.A.andA, Electr.Eng.,W354B, W.Aerodrome Warton, Nr Preston, Lancs. PR4 1AX / GB | 02 /
MACDIARMID, Ian Peter British A.M.A.and Aero, Elect.,W423, W. Aerodrome Warton, Nr Preston, Lancs. PR4 1AX / GB | 03 /
MOORE, Colin British A.M.A.and A, elec.Eng.,W354B , W.Arodrome Warton, Nr Preston, Lancs. PR4 1AX / GB | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Newell, William Joseph Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98962564.5 | 18.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998GB03837 | Priority number, date | GB19970026752 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726752 | GB19980023382 | 27.10.1998 Original published format: GB 9823382 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932962 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040408 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040408 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/02, G06F15/80 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G06F7/026 (EP,US);
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
H03M7/16 (EP,US);
H03M7/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2002/33] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | HIERARCHISCHE STRUKTUR ZUR SCHWELLENVERGLEICHUNG UNGEWOGENER BINÄRDATEN | [2000/40] | English: | WEIGHTLESS BINARY N-TUPLE THRESHOLDING HIERARCHIES | [2000/40] | French: | HIERARCHIES DE DEFINITION DE SEUILS N-TUPLES, BINAIRES ET SANS POIDS | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 01.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5623519 (BABCOCK MARK H [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11,14* column 1 *; | [A] - HANDS M A ET AL, "PROPOSAL FOR STOCHASTIC BIT STREAM PROCESSING USING OPTOELECTRONIC SMART PIXELS: A NEURAL NETWORK ARCHITECTURAL CASE STUDY", JOURNAL OF PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, (19970225), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 92 - 108, XP000655686 [A] 1,9,11,14 * page 92 - page 95 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jpdc.1996.1283 | [A] - LEIGHTON T ET AL, "ON PROBABILISTIC NETWORKS FOR SELECTION, MERGING, AND SORTING", 7TH.ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON PARALLEL ALGORITHMS AND ARCHITECTURES SPAA '95, SANTA BARBARA, JULY 17 - 19, 1995, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (19950717), no. SYMP. 6, pages 106 - 118, XP000659882 [A] 1,9,11,14 * page 117, column R, line 37 - line 48 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/215399.215429 |