EP1041907 - PANEL AND FRAME ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integral Window Systems Limited Holly Tree Lodge, Brownsover Lane Rugby, CV21 1HY / GB | [2001/31] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Nurcombe, Keith John Middle Moore House, Kites Hardwick Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 8AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Skinner, Michael Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Skinner, Michael Paul Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2000/41] | Skinner, Michael Paul c/o Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98962619.7 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998GB03894 | Priority number, date | GB19970027144 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9727144 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933378 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041907 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/20, E06B3/54 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
E06B7/10 (EP);
E06B3/5409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTE UND RAHMENANORDNUNG | [2000/41] | English: | PANEL AND FRAME ARRANGEMENT | [2000/41] | French: | ENSEMBLE PANNEAU ET CADRE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29704677U (GRZESKOWIAK, H.) [X] 1-5,8,14-18; | [X]US2617159 (LEIGHTON, G.A.) [X] 1-3,6-8,13-18; | [X]DE4022084 (L|KEN FENSTERZUBEH¯R GMBH) [X] 1-3,6,8,14-18; | [X]EP0599051 (NIEMANN, H.-D.) [X] 1,2,8,14-18 |