EP1069920 - SURGICAL DEVICE FOR THE IRRIGATION AND THE SUCTION OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRO SVILUPPO MATERIALI S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 100-102 00129 Roma / IT | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IELPO, Filippo, Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano, 100-102 I-00129 Rome / IT | 02 /
POCCI, Dante, Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano, 100-102 I-00129 Rome / IT | 03 /
PODRINI, Maurizio, Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A Via di Castel Romano, 100-102 I-00129 Rome / IT | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Leone, Mario Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Leone, Mario Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 98962666.8 | 16.12.1998 | [2001/04] | WO1998IT00365 | Priority number, date | IT1997RM00781 | 16.12.1997 Original published format: IT RM970781 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930758 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069920 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069920 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/148, A61M1/00, A61M3/02 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
A61M3/0208 (EP,US);
A61M1/774 (EP,US);
A61M3/022 (EP);
A61M3/0233 (EP,US);
A61M3/0283 (EP,US);
A61M5/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3109 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/04] | A61M5/148, B21H1/04, A61M1/00, A61M3/02, A01K91/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPÜLEN UND ABSAUGEN EINER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN LÖSUNG | [2001/04] | English: | SURGICAL DEVICE FOR THE IRRIGATION AND THE SUCTION OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL SOLUTION | [2001/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL POUR L'ASPERSION ET L'ASPIRATION D'UNE SOLUTION PHYSIOLOGIQUE | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2004 | BE | 04.08.2004 | CH | 04.08.2004 | FR | 04.08.2004 | LI | 04.08.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | DE | 05.11.2004 | ES | 15.11.2004 | GB | 16.12.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
DE | 05.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
GB | 16.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
DE | 05.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4516973 (TELANG ANIL [US]) [A] 4,5 * column 3, lines 25-31 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0278188 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4913698 (ITO HARUHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 38-47 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5368569 (SANESE CHRISTOPHER N [US]) [A] 6,7* figure 6 *; | [A]WO9427659 (GUIGNARD MIREILLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph L * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0676214 (MEDEX SA [FR]) [A] 3 * figure 4 * |