EP1075724 - POWER CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAPSTONE TURBINE CORPORATION 18700 Oxnard Street Tarzana California 91356 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states CAPSTONE TURBINE CORPORATION 18700 Oxnard Street Tarzana California 91356 / US | ||
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states CAPSTONE TURBINE CORPORATION 18700 Oxnard Street Tarzana, California 91356 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBRETH, Mark 21211 Nordhoff Street Chatsworth CA 91311 / US | 02 /
WACKNOV, Joel 6025 Yolanda Avenue Tarzana, CA 91356 / US | 03 /
WALL, Simon Apartment 132, 359 Howdencamp Road Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | [2001/12] |
Former [2001/07] | 01 /
GILBRETH, Mark 18700 Oxnard Street Tarzana, CA 91356 / US | ||
02 /
WACKNOV, Joel 6025 Yolanda Avenue Tarzana, CA 91356 / US | |||
03 /
WALL, Simon Apartment 132, 359 Howdencamp Road Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | Representative(s) | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2001/07] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98962993.6 | 08.12.1998 | [2001/07] | WO1998US26139 | Priority number, date | US19980080457P | 02.04.1998 Original published format: US 80457 P | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952193 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075724 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075724 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10, H02J1/14 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
H02J1/14 (EP);
H02J1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | ENERGIESTEUERUNG | [2001/07] | English: | POWER CONTROLLER | [2001/07] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05025283.2 / EP1638184 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2005 | BE | 23.11.2005 | CH | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | LI | 23.11.2005 | NL | 23.11.2005 | CY | 08.12.2005 | IE | 08.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | LU | 23.01.2006 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2395316 (BABICH VLADIMIR [SU]) [Y] 32 * page 2, line 27 - line 32 *; | [X]US4967096 (DIEMER JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 31,33,34 * column 12, line 41 - line 61; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5029062 (CAPEL ANTOINE [FR]) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [X]US5191520 (ECKERSLEY GREGORY P [AU]) [X] 58-76 * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 18 *; | [XAY]US5477091 (FIORINA JEAN-NOEL [FR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 58-76 [Y] 2; | [XY]US5512811 (LATOS THOMAS S [US], et al) [X] 31,33-48 * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 17; figure 1 * [Y] 32; | [XA]US5550410 (TITUS CHARLES H [US]) [X] 31,33,34 * column 2, line 28 - line 64; figure 1 * [A] 32; | [X]US5563802 (PLAHN PAUL H [US], et al) [X] 35-48,134-143 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 13; figures 2,3 *; | [PX]DE19704662 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 58-76* column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 18 * |