EP1042358 - FREE SOLUTION LIGAND INTERACTION MOLECULAR SEPARATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN REIS, Robert, D. 421 Hillcrest Way Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98963036.3 | 10.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US26251 | Priority number, date | US19970998413 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: US 998413 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933862 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042358 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042358 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/22, C07K1/16, C07K1/20, C07K1/32 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C07K1/34 (EP,US);
C07K1/16 (EP,US);
C07K1/20 (EP,US);
C07K1/22 (EP,US);
C07K1/32 (EP,US);
C07K1/36 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8813 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8827 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8831 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | AUF WECHSELWIRKUNG FREI GELÖSTER LIGANDEN BASIERENDE MOLEKÜLTRENNUNGSMETHODE | [2000/41] | English: | FREE SOLUTION LIGAND INTERACTION MOLECULAR SEPARATION METHOD | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION MOLECULAIRE PAR INTERACTION DE LIGAND EN SOLUTION LIBRE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 14.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05021609.2 / EP1634889 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.03.2006 | IT | 01.03.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/16] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0104356 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,14,15,21,23,24 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 15 * * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 6 *; | [A]US4762617 (STEVENS FRED J [US]) [A] 1,5* abstract * |