EP1056534 - TWIRLING STICK FOR A MIXING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melchior, Martin Theodor Neustrasse 50 D-66780 Rehlingen / DE | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 98963547.9 | 09.12.1998 | [2000/49] | WO1998EP07988 | Priority number, date | DE1997155059 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19755059 | [2000/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929407 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056534 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056534 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/00, B01F7/16, B28C5/42 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
B28C5/16 (EP);
B01F27/1142 (EP);
B01F27/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [2000/49] | Extension states | RO | 19.05.2000 | SI | 19.05.2000 | Title | German: | MISCHQUIRL FÜR EINE MISCHEINRICHTUNG | [2000/49] | English: | TWIRLING STICK FOR A MIXING DEVICE | [2000/49] | French: | FOUET A MELANGER POUR MELANGEUR | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 19.05.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.07.2001 | GB | 04.07.2001 | IT | 04.07.2001 | NL | 04.07.2001 | PT | 04.10.2001 | AT | 09.12.2001 | LU | 09.12.2001 | BE | 31.12.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 04.07.2001 | |
GB | 04.07.2001 | ||
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 09.12.2001 | ||
LU | 09.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GB | 04.07.2001 | |
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 09.12.2001 | ||
LU | 09.12.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GB | 04.07.2001 | |
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 09.12.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | GB | 04.07.2001 | |
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 09.12.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 04.07.2001 | |
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | GB | 04.07.2001 | |
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | GB | 04.07.2001 | |
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 04.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4175875 (VAN HORBEK JUDD [US]) [A] * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 29; figure 13 *; | [A]US4272198 (VELIKOV DANCHO N, et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, lines 1-24; figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2073297 (PFT PUTZ & FOERDERTECH) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4366123 (KATO AKIFUMI, et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 3, lines 47-64; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3615992 (MELCHIOR MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * column 3, lines 19-46; figure 1 * |