EP1047382 - KERATINOUS FIBRE OXIDATION DYEING COMPOSITION CONTAINING A LACCASE AND DYEING METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, IT | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Gérard 51 B, rue Robert Thomas F-95390 Saint Prix / FR | 02 /
COTTERET, Jean 13, rue du Pré Rousselin F-78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Miszputen, Laurent L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98963597.4 | 22.12.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998FR02832 | Priority number, date | FR19980000259 | 13.01.1998 Original published format: FR 9800259 | [2000/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936040 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047382 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047382 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1047382 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/10, A61K8/41, A61K8/49, A61K8/66 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/66 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/415 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/44] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSFÄRBEMITTEL FÜR KERATINFASERN, DAS EINE LACCASE ENTHÄLT UND VERFAHREN ZUR FÄRBUNG MIT DIESEM MITTEL | [2000/44] | English: | KERATINOUS FIBRE OXIDATION DYEING COMPOSITION CONTAINING A LACCASE AND DYEING METHOD USING SAME | [2000/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TEINTURE D'OXYDATION DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES CONTENANT UNE LACCASE ET PROCEDE DE TEINTURE METTANT EN OEUVRE CETTE COMPOSITION | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 08.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 09.03.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.08.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.01.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.04.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.08.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.02.2006 | Appeal received No. T0325/06 | 04.05.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.04.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 09.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | FI | 02.05.2003 | IE | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | CY | 22.12.2003 | LU | 22.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | CH | 31.12.2003 | LI | 31.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | IT | 22.12.2008 | ES | 23.12.2008 | [2013/51] |
Former [2007/04] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
IE | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0504005 (PERMA SA [FR]) [DY] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2694018 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 1-26* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0766958 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | Opposition | US3251742 | DE2155359 | EP0709365 | WO9719999 | WO9737633 | DK151397 | EP1504005 |