EP1040688 - Method and arragement for establishing data communication via a mobile telephone modem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/40] | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ESTABLISHING DATA COMMUNICATION VIA A MOBILE TELEPHONE MODEM | ||
[2006/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Mats Sofiavägen 5B S-222 41 Lund / SE | 02 /
KRISTENSEN, Espen Grovikveien 45 N-4635 Kristiansand / NO | 03 /
FJELDSÖ, Börre Heimdalsbakken 8 N-4800 Arendal / NO | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson IPC AB, P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2000/40] | Dahnér, Christer Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Patent Unit 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98963707.9 | 11.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998SE02290 | Priority number, date | SE19970004760 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: SE 9704760 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931907 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040688 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040688 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT [2000/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum aufbau einer Datenkommunikation über ein Mobiltelefonmodem | [2006/10] | English: | Method and arragement for establishing data communication via a mobile telephone modem | [2006/10] | French: | Procédé et agencement pour l'etablissement de communication de données via un modem de téléphone mobile | [2006/10] |
Former [2000/40] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBAU VON DATENKOMMUNIKATION ÜBER EIN MOBILTELEFONMODEM | ||
Former [2000/40] | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ESTABLISHING DATA COMMUNICATION VIA A MOBILE TELEPHONE MODEM | ||
Former [2000/40] | PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES VIA UN MODEM DE TELEPHONE MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | FR | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | DE | 22.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/22] | BE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | BE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
DE | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | BE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 21.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9411999 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]); | [A]EP0695075 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]); | [A]WO9635300 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |