EP1056539 - NICKEL DIIMINE CATALYSTS WITH METHYLALUMOXANE AS COCATALYST, METHOD OF POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS THEREWITH AND POLYMERS PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 216 Patent Library Building Bartlesville Technology Center Bartlesville, OK 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 216 Patent Library Building, Bartlesville Technology Center Bartlesville, OK 74004 / US | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 4th and Keeler Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EILERTS, Nancy, W. 1361 Evergreen Drive Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 02 /
HAWLEY, Gil, R. 1022 N. Wyandotte Dewey, OK 74029 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/49] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98963799.6 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/49] | WO1998US25889 | Priority number, date | US19970994490 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: US 994490 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932226 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056539 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/00, B01J37/00, C08F4/02, C08F4/60, C08F4/06, C08F210/00, C08F10/14, C08F110/14, C08F210/14, C08F10/00 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B01J31/2234 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/143 (EP,US);
B01J31/1805 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/7006 (US,EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/07 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/49] | B01J31/00, B01J37/00, C08F4/02, C08F4/60, C08F4/06, C08F210/00, C08F10/14, C08F110/14, C08F210/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | NICKEL-DIIMIN-KATALYSATOR MIT METHYLALUMOXAN ALS CO-KATALYSATOR, VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DES KATALYSATORS UND DAMIT PRODUZIERTE POLYMERE | [2000/49] | English: | NICKEL DIIMINE CATALYSTS WITH METHYLALUMOXANE AS COCATALYST, METHOD OF POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS THEREWITH AND POLYMERS PRODUCED | [2000/49] | French: | CATALYSEURS A BASE DE DIIMINE DE NICKEL AVEC COMME COCATALYSEUR LE METHYLALUMOXANE, PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION DES OLEFINES UTILISANT LESDITS CATALYSEURS ET POLYMERES AINSI PRODUITS | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5168111 (CANICH JO ANN MARIE [US]) [X] 13,14 * examples 8-11,24,35,36 *; | [X]WO9623010 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * example 13 * * example 281 * * example 246 * * example 477 * * example 408 *; | [X]US5547675 (CANICH JO ANN MARIE [US]) [X] 13,14 * examples 8-10; table II *; | [X]JPH09272713 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [X] 1,4,5,9,11,14 * translation, examples 1-3 *; | [PX]WO9748736 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [PX] 1-7,9-14 * examples P2-1; table V * * page 6, line 6 - line 9 *; | [E]EP0884331 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [E] 1-4,9,11,13,14* claims 1-11 * | International search | [A]US3592870 (DUNN HOWARD E); | [A]US3949013 (YOO JIN SUN, et al); | [XP]US5844055 (BRANT PATRICK [US], et al); | [A]US5852145 (MCLAIN STEPHAN JAMES [US], et al); | [XE]US5866663 (BROOKHART MAURICE S [US], et al) |