EP1042829 - Battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/41] | BATTERY CATHODE | ||
[2009/18] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [2008/14] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states DURACELL INC. Berkshire Industrial Park Bethel, Connecticut 06801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODNORTH, Douglas, J. 90 Manning Street Needham, MA 02194 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Peter, B. 89 Lowell Drive Stow, MA 01775 / US | 03 /
TAY, George, I. 275 High Ridge Road Southbury, CT 06488 / US | 04 /
FARISS, Gregory, A. 57 Todd Hill Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | 05 /
BRYS, Barbara 24 Wayte Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 06 /
CERVERA, James 7 Crestview Avenue Medway, MA 06410 / US | 07 /
HAMILTON, Terry, L. 3 Pilgrim Drive Danbury, CT 06811 / US | 08 /
HOWARD, Martin, W. 137 Old King's Highway Wilton, CT 06897 / US | [2001/08] |
Former [2000/41] | 01 /
WOODNORTH, Douglas, J. 90 Manning Street Needham, MA 02194 / US | ||
02 /
HARRIS, Peter, B. 89 Lowell Drive Stow, MA 01775 / US | |||
03 /
TAY, George, I. 7105 Spruce Pine Trail Waxhaw, NC 28173 / US | |||
04 /
FARISS, Gregory, A. 57 Todd Hill Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | |||
05 /
BRYS, Barbara 24 Wayte Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
06 /
CERVERA, James 7 Crestview Avenue Medway, MA 06410 / US | |||
07 /
HAMILTON, Terry, L. 3 Tewcomb Drive Danbury, CT 06811 / US | |||
08 /
HOWARD, Martin, W. 98 Brooklawn Parkway Fairfield, CT 06432 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98963897.8 | 14.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US26490 | Priority number, date | US19970001822 | 31.12.1997 Original published format: US 1822 | US19980054928 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: US 54928 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9934462 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042829 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/30, H01M4/62 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H01M4/244 (EP);
H01M50/414 (EP,US);
H01M4/50 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP);
H01M50/429 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,US);
H01M6/08 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (EP);
H01M50/44 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | H01M4/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | Batterie | [2009/18] | English: | Battery | [2009/18] | French: | Pile | [2009/18] |
Former [2000/41] | BATTERIE KATHODE | ||
Former [2000/41] | BATTERY CATHODE | ||
Former [2000/41] | CATHODE DE PILE | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60241646 ; | [X]JPH07282802 ; | [A]JPS6394559 ; | [X] - TAKEDA K, "OPTIMIZING THE PARAMETERS OF CELL EXPANSION IN ALKALINE MANGANESE DIOXIDE BUTTON CELLS", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19900701), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 9 - 17, XP000160866 [X] 1-6,10,12-15 * table 1 * * page 12, paragraphs 3,4 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(90)80029-D | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860416), vol. 010, no. 099, Database accession no. (E - 396), & JP60241646 A 19851130 (FUJI DENKI KAGAKU KK) [X] 1-6,12-15 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07282802 A 19951027 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880907), vol. 012, no. 330, Database accession no. (E - 655), & JP63094559 A 19880425 (TOSHIBA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-6,12-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS60240056 (FUJI ELECTROCHEMICAL CO LTD) |