EP1038301 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BAND-SHAPED SUPRACONDUCTOR WITH HIGH Tc SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/39] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BAND-SHAPED SUPRACONDUCTOR WITH HIGH T c? SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL AND SUPRACONDUCTOR PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD | ||
[2001/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUTZ, Stefan Mühlweg 3 D-90607 Rückersdorf / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Bernhard Hammersbacherstr. 36c D-63486 Bruchköbel / DE | 03 /
ROAS, Bernhard Lucas-Cranach-Strasse 34 D-89520 Heidenheim / DE | 04 /
KÜHNL, Manfred In der Reuth 5 D-91336 Heroldsbach / DE | [2000/46] |
Former [2000/39] | 01 /
KAUTZ, Stefan Mühlweg 3 D-90607 Rückersdorf / DE | ||
02 /
FISCHER, Bernhard Fürther Strasse 13 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | |||
03 /
ROAS, Bernhard Lucas-Cranach-Strasse 34 D-89520 Heidenheim / DE | |||
04 /
KÜHNL, Manfred In der Reuth 5 D-91336 Heroldsbach / DE | Representative(s) | Westphal, Klaus Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Westphal, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98964376.2 | 02.12.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998DE03554 | Priority number, date | DE1997154669 | 09.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19754669 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930332 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038301 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038301 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01B12/04 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H01B12/04 (EP,US);
H10N60/0801 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US);
Y10S505/928 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BANDFÖRMIGEN SUPRALEITERS MIT HOCH-Tc-SUPRALEITERMATERIAL | [2001/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BAND-SHAPED SUPRACONDUCTOR WITH HIGH Tc SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL | [2001/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN SUPRACONDUCTEUR EN FORME DE BANDE AVEC UN MATERIAU SUPRACONDUCTEUR PRESENTANT UN POINT ELEVE (Tc) DE CHANGEMENT BRUSQUE DE LA CONDUCTIVITE | [2001/38] |
Former [2000/39] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BANDFÖRMIGEN SUPRALEITERS MIT HOCH-T c?-SUPRALEITERMATERIAL SOWIE MIT DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER SUPRALEITER | ||
Former [2000/39] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BAND-SHAPED SUPRACONDUCTOR WITH HIGH T c? SUPRACONDUCTIVE MATERIAL AND SUPRACONDUCTOR PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2000/39] | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN SUPRACONDUCTEUR EN FORME DE BANDE AVEC UN MATERIAU SUPRACONDUCTEUR PRESENTANT UN POINT ELEVE (T c?) DE CHANGEMENT BRUSQUE DE LA CONDUCTIVITE, ET SUPRACONDUCTEUR PRODUIT AU MOYEN DUDIT PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5208215 (CHEN KOUTH [TW], et al); | [A]US5399312 (LIU RU-SHI [TW], et al) |