EP1038012 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANSGENIC PLANTS WITH MODIFIED 5-AMINOLEVULINIC ACID BIOSYNTHESIS, METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING 5-AMINOLEVULINIC ACID SYNTHESIS EFFECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2002/36] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Frank Letzter Hasenpfad 8 D-60598 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
DONN, Günter Sachsenring 35 D-65619 Hofheim / DE | [2000/39] | Application number, filing date | 98964495.0 | 10.12.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998EP08028 | Priority number, date | DE1997154929 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19754929 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9929880 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1038012 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, G01N33/50, A01H5/00 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12N15/8243 (EP,US);
C12N15/8274 (EP,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG TRANSGENER PFLANZEN MIT VERÄNDERTER 5-AMINOLÄVULINSÄURE-BIOSYNTHESE UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON EFFEKTOREN DER 5-AMINOLÄVULINSÄURE-SYNTHESE | [2000/39] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANSGENIC PLANTS WITH MODIFIED 5-AMINOLEVULINIC ACID BIOSYNTHESIS, METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING 5-AMINOLEVULINIC ACID SYNTHESIS EFFECTORS | [2000/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PLANTES TRANSGENIQUES PAR BIOSYNTHESE MODIFIEE D'ACIDE 5-AMINOLEVULINIQUE, ET PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION D'EFFECTEURS DE LA SYNTHESE D'ACIDE 5-AMINOLEVULINIQUE | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9720209 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 25,28 * Seite 2; Tabelle 1 + 2, Patentansprüche *; | [PX]WO9824920 (INST PFLANZENGENETIK & KULTUR [DE], et al) [PX] 1,3-7,17-20,32 * Zusammenfassung; Seiten 3,4,5,6,8,9,11,12; Patentansprüche * | [XY] - TYACKE, R.J., ET AL., "reactions of glutamate semialdehyde aminotransferase (glutamate-1-semialdehyde 2,1 aminomutase) with vinyl and acetylenic substrate analogues analysed by rapid scanning spectrophotometry", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 309, no. pt1, pages 307 - 313, XP002111578 [X] 22-24,26,27,29 * the whole document * [Y] 25,28 | [XY] - HOOBER, J.K., ET AL., "biosynthesis of delta-aminolevulinate in greening barley leaves. IX. structure of the substrate, mode of gabaculine inhibition, and the catalytic mechanism of gabaculine 1-semialdehyde aminotransferase", CARLSBERG RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1988), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 11 - 25, XP002111579 [X] 22,24,26,27 * Zusammenfassung, Seite 21; Abb. 10 * [Y] 25,28 | [Y] - WANG, W., "literature review on duckweed toxicity testing", ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 7 - 22, XP002111580 [Y] 25,28 * Seiten 9,10,16; Tabelle 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0013-9351(05)80147-1 | [A] - ALLISON,G., ET AL., "a suicide vector for allelic recombination involving the gene for glutamate 1-semialdehyde aminotransferase in the cyanobacterium Synechoccus PCC 7942", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, (199707), vol. 255, pages 392 - 399, XP002100536 [A] 1-21,31,32 * Zusammenfassung, Seite 392, 395; Abb. 4, Seite 398 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004380050511 | [DA] - ZAVGORODNYAYA A ET AL, "YEAST 5-AMINOLEVULINATE SYNTHASE PROVIDES ADDITIONAL CHLOROPHYLL IN TRANSGENIC TOBACCO", PLANT JOURNAL, (199707), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 169 - 178, XP002069810 [DA] 1-21,31,32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.12010169.x | [A] - GOUGH, S., ETA L., "glutamate 1-semialdehyde aminotransferase as a target for herbicides", TARGET ASSAYS MOD. HERBIC. RELAT. PHYTOTOXIC COMP. PUBLISHER: LEWIS BOCA RATON, FL.; EDITOR: BOEGER,P.; SANDMANN,G., (1993), pages 21 - 27, XP002100535 [A] 1-21,31,32 | [A] - ABELL ET AL, "biochemical approaches to herbicide discovery: advances in enzyme target identification and inhibitor design", WEED SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 44, pages 734 - 742, XP002094170 [A] 1-21,31,32 * page 736, column R * | [A] - FOSTER, S. AND HOEFGEN, R., "towards a rational design of pesticides", BCPC MONOGRAPH NO. 55. OPPORTUNITIES FOR MOLECULAR BIOLOGY IN CROP PRODUCTION, (1993), pages 75 - 81, XP002100537 [A] 1-21,31,32 * page 78 * | [A] - HOEFGEN ET AL, "a visible marker for antisense mRNA expression in plants: inhibition of chlorophyll synthesis with a glutamate-1 -semialdehyde aminotransferase antisense gene", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (199403), vol. 91, pages 1726 - 1730, XP002093834 [A] 1-21,31,32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.5.1726 | [DA] - NEIDLE, E.L. AND KAPLAN, S., "expression of the rhodobacter sphaeroides hemA and hemT genes, encoding two 5-aminolevulinic acid synthase isozymes", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199304), vol. 175, no. 8, pages 2292 - 2303, XP002100547 [DA] 1-21,31,32 * the whole document * |