EP0961707 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING A TWO-PART GEAR LEVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Scania CV Aktiebolag (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Lars Eknäs Gärd S-151 92 Södertälje / SE | [1999/49] | Application number, filing date | 98964608.8 | 16.12.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998SE02333 | Priority number, date | SE19970004726 | 18.12.1997 Original published format: SE 9704726 | [1999/49] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933681 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961707 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961707 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K20/04, G05G1/04 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
B60K20/02 (EP,US);
B60K20/04 (SE);
F16H59/0278 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20612 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20624 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/49] | Title | German: | EINSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ZWEITEILIGEN GETRIEBESCHALTHEBEL | [2002/04] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING A TWO-PART GEAR LEVER | [1999/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE POUR LEVIER DE VITESSE A DEUX PARTIES | [1999/49] |
Former [1999/49] | EINSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ZWEITEILIGEN HEBEL | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1999 | Translation filed | 20.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SE439464 (VOLVO AB [SE]); | [A]DE3613480 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]); | [A]US5144853 (GIUDICI MARINO [IT]); | [A]FR2752779 (PEUGEOT [FR]) | Examination | US2985474 |