EP1042799 - HYDROFLUOROCARBON ETCHING COMPOUNDS WITH REDUCED GLOBAL WARMING IMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMMIN, Timothy, R. 87 Havenwood Lane Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | 02 /
LULY, Matthew, H. 5 Squirrel Run Lancaster, NY 14096 / US | 03 /
FATHIMULLA, Mohammed, A. 2408 Hannon Court Ellieott City, MD 21042 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/41] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Honeywell AG, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98964886.0 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US27426 | Priority number, date | US19970001755 | 31.12.1997 Original published format: US 1755 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9934427 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042799 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/311 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
H01L21/31116 (EP,US);
H01L21/306 (KR);
Y02C20/30 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2001/48] |
Former [2000/41] | DE, FR, IE, NL | Title | German: | FLUORKOHLENWASSERSTOFF-ÄTZMITTEL MIT REDUZIERTEM EINFLUSS AUF DIE GLOBALE ERWÄRMUNG | [2000/41] | English: | HYDROFLUOROCARBON ETCHING COMPOUNDS WITH REDUCED GLOBAL WARMING IMPACT | [2000/41] | French: | COMPOSES DE GRAVURE HYDROFLUOROCARBONES A EFFET DE SERRE REDUIT | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0651434 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,11,12,17-19 * claims 1-16 * [Y] 20; | [XA]JPH04346427 ; | JPH04346427 [ ] (SONY CORP) [ ] * the whole document *; | [Y]US5445712 (YANAGIDA TOSHIHARU [JP]) [Y] 20 * abstract *; | [PX]WO9836449 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,7,17-20,22 * the whole document *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930421), vol. 017, no. 203, Database accession no. (E - 1354), & JP04346427 A 19921202 (YANAGIDA TOSHIHARU) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 11-13 | [A] - OZONACTION, (199704), no. 22, XP002099821 [A] 8-10 * ISSN 1020-1602, United Nations Environment Programme Industry and Environment (UNEP IE) Newsletter, * * Retrieved from Internet: | [A] - CHAE H ET AL, "PFC Replacements: Initial DuPont Assessments and Process Studies", [ONLINE], XP002099881 [A] 13-16 * the whole document * |