EP1035953 - MONITORING AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MONITORING A TECHNICAL FACILITY SUBJECT TO ENHANCED SAFETY REQUIREMENTS, ESPECIALLY A HANDLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 97 35435 Wettenberg / DE | For all designated states Reis GmbH & Co. Maschinenfabrik Im Weidig 1-4 63785 Obernburg / DE | [2003/31] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Elan Schaltelemente GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 95 35435 Wettenberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Reis GmbH & Co. Maschinenfabrik Im Weidig 1-4 63785 Obernburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIEGLER, Olaf Auestrasse 35 D-56379 Geilnau / DE | 02 /
BERBERICH, Georg St. Urbanusstrasse 32 D-63927 Bürgstadt / DE | 03 /
SOM, Franz Neffeberg 18 D-64750 Lützelbach / DE | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2000/38] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965769.7 | 05.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998EP07914 | Priority number, date | DE1997154208 | 06.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19754208 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9929474 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1035953 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035953 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/06 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B25J19/0004 (EP,US);
B25J19/06 (EP,US);
B25J9/1674 (EP,US);
G05B19/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGS- UND STEUERGERÄT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER TECHNISCHEN ANLAGE MIT ERHÖHTEN SICHERHEITSANFORDERUNGEN, INSBESONDERE EINES HANDHABUNGSGERÄTES | [2000/38] | English: | MONITORING AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MONITORING A TECHNICAL FACILITY SUBJECT TO ENHANCED SAFETY REQUIREMENTS, ESPECIALLY A HANDLING DEVICE | [2000/38] | French: | APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE COMMANDE ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE INSTALLATION TECHNIQUE SOUMISE A DES EXIGENCES ELEVEES EN MATIERE DE SECURITE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN APPAREIL DE MANIPULATION | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 11.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02003224.9 / EP1267234 | EP02003225.6 / EP1239354 | EP02003226.4 / EP1247622 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.2003 | LI | 31.12.2003 | [2004/51] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0465710 (ELEKTRONIK GERAETEWERK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10,12-19,21,22,39 * page 5, line 51 - page 12, line 43; figures 1-9 *; | [X]EP0096830 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,21,39 * page 2, line 25 - page 15, line 6; figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US5060544 (HANAKI YOSHIMARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,21,39 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9641705 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [A]US5418440 (SAKAGUCHI YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [A]US4776433 (LAGREE JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * the whole document * |