EP1040344 - MICRO-SLIT CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE | [2000/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBASCH, Hans-Jörg DI Verstorben / DE | 02 /
WERNER, Carsten Hübnerstr. 13 D-01069 Dresden / DE | 03 /
KÖRBER, Heinz Heideflügel 3 D-01324 Dresden / DE | [2001/41] |
Former [2000/40] | 01 /
JACOBASCH, Hans-Jörg DI Verstorben / DE | ||
02 /
WERNER, Carsten Am Heideberg 7 D-01824 Königstein / DE | |||
03 /
KÖRBER, Heinz Heideflügel 3 D-01324 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Postfach 27 01 75 01172 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Rauschenbach, Marion, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwältin Postfach 27 01 75 01172 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965779.6 | 07.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998EP07943 | Priority number, date | DE1997155183 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19755183 | [2000/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930141 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040344 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040344 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G01N27/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | MIKRO-SPALTZELLE | [2000/40] | English: | MICRO-SLIT CELL | [2000/40] | French: | CELLULE A MICROFENTE | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.01.2002 | [2002/27] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0450758 ; | [A]JPS56125653 ; | [A]US4175233 (BAIER ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 28 - column 3, line 38; figure - *; | [AD]DD222692 (ADW DDR [DD]) [AD] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4345152 (INST POLYMERFORSCHUNG DRESDEN [DE]) [AD] 1,3,4,6 * column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 2; figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920529), vol. 016, no. 237, Database accession no. (P - 1362), & JP04050758 A 19920219 (EBARA INFILCO) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811222), vol. 005, no. 202, Database accession no. (P - 095), & JP56125653 A 19811002 (KUREHA CHEM IND) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |