EP1053582 - CONTROL CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICOLAI, Walter Bahnhofstrasse 31 D-35418 Buseck / DE | 02 /
PAWLOWSKI, Adam Ahornweg 26 D-35713 Eschenburg-Wissenbach / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stefan Am Steinacker 4 D-35080 Bad Endbach / DE | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 98966406.5 | 24.12.1998 | [2000/47] | WO1998EP08450 | Priority number, date | DE19981004901 | 07.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19804901 | [2000/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940659 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053582 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053582 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/56 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
H05K7/20572 (EP,US);
H02B1/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] | Title | German: | SCHALTSCHRANK | [2000/47] | English: | CONTROL CABINET | [2000/47] | French: | ARMOIRE DE COMMANDE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4135894 (RITTAL-WERK RUDOLF LOH GMBH & CO KG)[Y] 2,4,5; | [XY]DE9315017U (HUELLER HILLE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-8 [Y] 2,4,5 |