EP1046198 - ELECTRIC CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENDER, Günther Mühlweg 25 D-61191 Rodheim (Rosbach) / DE | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2000/43] | Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 98966987.4 | 28.12.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998EP08481 | Priority number, date | DE1998100707 | 10.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19800707 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9935712 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046198 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046198 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R3/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
H05K1/028 (EP,US);
F02D11/10 (KR);
H01R12/58 (EP,US);
H01R4/48 (US);
H05K1/0278 (EP,US);
H05K3/326 (EP,US);
H01R4/4823 (EP);
H05K1/167 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNG | [2000/43] | English: | ELECTRIC CONNECTOR | [2000/43] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5131362 (SIMON EWALD [DE], et al); | [A]EP0596392 (WEBER SRL [IT]); | [A]WO9534106 (TESSERA INC [US]); | [A]US5481141 (BROWN RICHARD L [US], et al); | [XA]US5672818 (SCHAEFER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) |