EP0928054 - Electrostatic discharge protection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road, (MS 12) Santa Clara, CA 95056-0951 / US | [2006/42] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states SILICONIX INCORPORATED 2201 Laurelwood Road, (MS 12) Santa Clara, CA 95056-0951 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Richard K. 10292 Norwich Avenue Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/27] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Daimler-Benz AG, Intellectual Property Management, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100016.7 | 04.01.1999 | [1999/27] | Priority number, date | US19970002179 | 31.12.1997 Original published format: US 2179 | [1999/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928054 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928054 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928054 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04, H01L27/02 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
H01L27/0255 (EP,US);
H01L27/06 (KR);
H01L27/0814 (EP,US);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/33] |
Former [1999/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schutzschaltung gegen elektrostatische Entladung | [1999/27] | English: | Electrostatic discharge protection circuit | [1999/27] | French: | Circuit de protection contre les décharges électrostatiques | [1999/27] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 17.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06021653.8 / EP1753109 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | GB | 18.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | NL | 18.10.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | NL | 18.10.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 18.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5500546 (MARUM STEVEN E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 18 - line 31; figures 3,3A *; | [A]EP0379199 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |