EP0929070 - Disk cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikebe, Masaru 3367-35, Iwamurata Saku-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Okamura, Masatoshi 411, Yokowa Saku-shi, Nagano / JP | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100137.1 | 08.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | JP19980013509 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1350998 | JP19980104219 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: JP 10421998 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0929070 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0929070 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929070 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
G11B23/0308 (EP,US);
G11B23/0311 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenkassette | [1999/28] | English: | Disk cartridge | [1999/28] | French: | Cassette à disque | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPS58212665 ; | [A]EP0248908 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 4-7* page 6, line 6 - page 27, line 16; figures 5-8 *; | EP0255185 [ ] (OPTICAL STORAGE INT [NL]) [ ] * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 9 *; | [X]EP0335461 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0496511 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 4,5 * column 5, line 28 - column 11, line 40; figures 5-8 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840327), vol. 008, no. 065, Database accession no. (P - 263), & JP58212665 A 19831210 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK;OTHERS: 01) [DX] 1 * abstract * |