EP0933412 - Water-resistant adhesive based on a vinyl acetate emulsion polymer containing a nonionic polyurethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington Delaware 19803-7663 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farwaha, Rajeev 59 Ashwood Crescent Brampton, Ontario L6T 1M1 / CA | 02 /
Northover, James A. 1791 Pattinson Crescent Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1H6 / CA | 03 /
Liverance, Patricia A.M. 354 Strathallan Street Fergus, Ontario N1M 3L3 / CA | 04 /
Yearwood, Godric S. 2303 Eglinton Avenue East, No. 419 Scarborough, Ontario M1K 2N6 / CA | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100354.2 | 14.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | US19980016378 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 16378 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0933412 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09J151/00, C08F218/08, C09J175/06 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C09J151/00 (EP,US);
C08F218/08 (EP,US);
C08F261/04 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31989 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F261/04, C08F218/08 (EP,US);
C08F283/006, C08F218/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, LI [2000/15] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserresistentklebstoff auf Basis von Vinylacetatemulsionpolymeren enthaltend Nicht-ionisches Polyurethan | [1999/31] | English: | Water-resistant adhesive based on a vinyl acetate emulsion polymer containing a nonionic polyurethane | [1999/31] | French: | Adhésif avec une résistance à l'eau basé sur une émulsion de polymère d'acétate de vinyle contenant un polyuréthane non-ionique | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 05.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5821294 (PERLINSKI WITOLD [US]) [PX] 1-8 * column 3, line 54-58 ; column 6, line 49-50 ; column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 12 ; column 2, line 36-42 ; column 4, line 13-20 ; column 4, line 34-65 ; claim 2 ; column 5, line 45-55 *; column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 8 *; | [PXY]EP0872496 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PX] 1-6 * page 3, line 12-14 *; page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 33; claims 1-6 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]WO9628489 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [Y] 7,8 * page 10, lines 8-22 *; | [Y]US4963422 (KATZ HOWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9413726 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0665278 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0517695 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930604), vol. 017, no. 291, Database accession no. (C - 1067), & JP05017695 A 19930126 (YUNICHIKA KEMIKARU KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |