EP0912058 - Method and apparatus for providing broadcast data services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sedna Patent Services, LLC 1500 Market Street, 27th Floor West Tower Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Sedna Patent Services, LLC 1500 Market Street, 27th Floor West Tower Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Sedna Patent Services, LLC 1500 Market Street, 27th Floor West Tower Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS, INC. 7700 Wisconsin Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814-3522 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendricks, John S. 8723 Persimmon Tree Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
Bonner, Alfred E. 8300 Bradley Boulevard Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 03 /
Wunderlich, Richard E. 2390 Hopewell Plantation Drive Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | 04 /
Berkobin, Eric C. 108 Hillview Court Woodstock, GA 30188 / US | [1999/32] |
Former [1999/17] | 01 /
Hendricks, John S. 8723 Persimmon Tree Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | ||
02 /
Bonner, Alfred E. 8300 Bradley Boulevard Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | |||
03 /
Wunderlich, Richard E. 290 Sweet Briar Court Alpharetta, GA 30201 / US | |||
04 /
Berkobin, Eric C. 108 Hillview Court Woodstock, GA 30188 / US | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/17] | Application number, filing date | 99100375.7 | 02.12.1993 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | US19920991074 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: US 991074 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0912058 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0912058 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912058 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/167 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (KR);
H04H20/06 (EP,US);
H04H20/10 (EP,US);
H04H20/42 (EP,US);
H04H20/79 (EP,US);
H04H20/86 (EP,US);
H04H60/04 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04H60/39 (EP,US);
H04H60/47 (EP,US);
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04N21/2181 (EP,US);
H04N21/21815 (EP,US);
H04N21/2187 (EP,US);
H04N21/2221 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/2381 (EP,US);
H04N21/2389 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/26208 (EP,US);
H04N21/26283 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4184 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42206 (EP,US);
H04N21/42653 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4385 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/47211 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N21/64307 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/6547 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8146 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/8173 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N5/44504 (EP,US);
H04N5/602 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
H04N7/0882 (EP,US);
H04N7/0884 (EP,US);
H04N7/0887 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04N7/102 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
H04N7/17354 (EP,US);
H04H20/02 (EP,US);
H04H20/78 (EP,US);
H04H20/95 (EP,US);
H04H2201/70 (EP,US);
H04H60/22 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US);
H04H60/74 (EP,US);
H04H60/94 (EP,US);
H04H60/96 (EP,US);
H04H60/97 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Rundfunkdatendiensten | [1999/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing broadcast data services | [1999/17] | French: | Procédé et appareil à fournir des services de données de télédiffusion | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94904392.1 / EP0673583 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | SE | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | ES | 06.03.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
SE | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | GR | 24.02.2005 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 24.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8909528 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 1-86 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0355697 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,24,31,45,54,66,74,78,83 * the whole document * [A] 2-23,25-27,29,30,32-44,46-53,55-65,67-73,75-77,79-82,84-86; | [A]WO9010988 (VIEWFACTS INC [US]) [A] 1-86 * the whole document *; | [YA]WO9100670 (SUPERGUIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,24,28,31,45,54,66,74,78,83 * the whole document * [A] 2-23,25-27,29,30,32-44,46-53,55-65,67-73,75-77,79-82,84-86; | [YA]WO9210040 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [Y] 1,24,28,31,45,54,66,74,78,83 * the whole document * [A] 2-23,25-27,29,30,32-44,46-53,55-65,67-73,75-77,79-82,84-86; | [A]US5144663 (KUDELSKI ANDRE [CH], et al) [A] 1-86* the whole document *; | [YA]DE4214184 (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,24,28,31,45,54,66,74,78,83 * the whole document * [A] 2-23,25-27,29,30,32-44,46-53,55-65,67-73,75-77,79-82,84-86; | [A]EP0513553 (COMMODORE ELECTRONICS LTD [BS]) [A] 1-86 * the whole document * |