EP0930232 - Method and device for shaping and dosing a soft, pastous product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natec Reich, Summer GmbH & Co. KG Kolpingstrasse 32 88178 Heimenkirch / DE | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schönegg, Klaus Fährtwiesenstrasse 4 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
Zeuschner, Roland Aufreute 1 88260 Argenbühl-Siggen / DE | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100476.3 | 12.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | DE19981001402 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19801402 | [1999/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930232 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930232 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/12 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
B65B9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/13] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Formgebung und Portionierung eines weichen, pastösen Produkts | [1999/29] | English: | Method and device for shaping and dosing a soft, pastous product | [1999/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la mise en forme et le dosage d' un produit mou et pâteux | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.07.2003 | GB | 30.07.2003 | ES | 10.11.2003 | AT | 12.01.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/36] | GB | 30.07.2003 | |
ES | 10.11.2003 | ||
AT | 12.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | GB | 30.07.2003 | |
ES | 10.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 30.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2259121 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,10,13 * page 6, line 8 - page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0503781 (GEN FOODS KRAFT CANADA [CA]) [A] 1,8* column 2, line 37 - line 57; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3841945 | DE19501106 |