EP0930103 - Paint roller and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KON-CAD GmbH Konstruktionsbüro für Elektrotechnik und Maschinenbau Nordring 26 90408 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jena, Hans-Peter Paniersplatz 15 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Böhme, Volker Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [1999/29] | Böhme, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Karolinenstrasse 27 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100797.2 | 18.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | DE1998101868 | 20.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19801868 | [1999/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0930103 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0930103 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/02 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
B05C17/02 (EP);
B05C17/0207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Farbroller und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1999/29] | English: | Paint roller and its manufacturing process | [1999/29] | French: | Rouleau à peindre et son procédé de fabrication | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2001 | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1406573 (PARDIMENE JEAN JOSEPH LUCIEN) [A] 1,9 * page 1 - page 2; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0589305 (PADCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | DE7109745U |