EP0909699 - Bolt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/16] | Bicycle crank arm parts/assembly and assembly tools | ||
[2002/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanaki, Masahiro c/o Shimano Inc. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99100804.6 | 02.08.1996 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | JP19950219835 | 04.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21983595 | JP19960046657 | 08.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4665796 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0909699 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0909699 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909699 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62M3/00 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
B62M3/003 (EP,US);
B25B13/48 (EP,US);
B25B27/0071 (EP,US);
B62M3/00 (EP,US);
F16B35/048 (EP,US);
F16B35/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/16] | Title | German: | Bolzen | [2002/01] | English: | Bolt | [2002/01] | French: | Boulon | [2002/01] |
Former [1999/16] | Kurbelarmanordnung für ein Fahrrad und Montagewerkzeug | ||
Former [1999/16] | Bicycle crank arm parts/assembly and assembly tools | ||
Former [1999/16] | Dispositif de pédalier pour bicyclette et dispositif d'assemblage | Examination procedure | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96305711.2 / EP0756991 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2446846 (WARREN NOBLE) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2587965 (TA BREVETS GEORGES NAVET SPECI [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US3352190 (CARLSON RAYMOND H); | [A]FR2501615 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) | Examination | US3408092 | US1138956 | US1389997 |