EP0933572 - Shut-off valve for water pipelines or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlösser Armaturen GmbH Im Dohm 3 57462 Olpe / DE | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Schlösser Haustechnik GmbH Im Dohm 3 57462 Olpe/Biggesee / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rinscheid, Günter Zollstrasse 7 57482 Wenden-Römershagen / DE | 02 /
Stach, Olaf Birkenweg 8 57462 Olpe / DE | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Pürckhauer, Rolf Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Pürckhauer, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100805.3 | 18.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | DE1998104114 | 03.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19804114 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933572 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933572 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/02, F16K1/10 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
F16K27/0272 (EP);
F16K1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [2001/49] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Absperrarmatur für Wasserleitungen o.dgl. | [1999/31] | English: | Shut-off valve for water pipelines or the like | [1999/31] | French: | Soupape d'arrêt pour des conduites d'eau ou analogues | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/29] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2191688 (GRUPUL IND PETROCHIMIE [RO]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 25 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1052414 (TRUMP, A. L.) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 29 * |