EP0931936 - Gerotor motor and improved valve drive and brake assembly therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yakimow, Scott Edward 51 McAndrews Road, W. 324 Burnsville, Minnesota 55337 / US | 02 /
Uppal, Sohan Lal 8334 Virginia Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55438 / US | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100947.3 | 20.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | US19980012638 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: US 12638 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931936 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0931936 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00, F04C2/10 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
F04C15/0057 (EP,US);
F04C15/0084 (EP,US);
F04C2/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [2000/14] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Innenzahnradmotor und Verteilerventil und Feststellbremse | [1999/30] | English: | Gerotor motor and improved valve drive and brake assembly therefor | [1999/30] | French: | Moteur à engrenage intérieur et soupape commutateur avec frein de stationnement | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 23.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3616882 (WHITE HARVEY CLINTON) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3125087 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0870922 (EATON CORP [US]) [PA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3616882 | US4981423 | US5228846 | US4533302 |