EP0947886 - Electrophotographic imaging member with a support layer containing polyethylene naphthalate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/40] | Electrophotographic imaging member with improved support layer | ||
[2004/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2005/46] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parikh, Satish R. 80 Treebrook Drive Rochester, New York 14625 / US | 02 /
Grabowski, Edward F. 479 Sherborne Road New York 14580 / US | 03 /
Roetker, Michael S. 35 Darwin Street Rochester, New York 14610 / US | 04 /
Evans, Kent J. 1245 York Street Lima, New York 14485 / US | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101222.0 | 22.01.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | US19980049377 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: US 49377 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0947886 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0947886 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947886 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/10 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G03G5/142 (EP,US);
G03G5/04 (EP,US);
G03G5/047 (EP,US);
G03G5/055 (EP,US);
G03G5/0659 (EP,US);
G03G5/0696 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/52] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Aufzeichnungselement mit Polyethylennaphthalat enthaltender Trägerschicht | [2004/50] | English: | Electrophotographic imaging member with a support layer containing polyethylene naphthalate | [2004/50] | French: | Elément électrophotographique comprenant une couche support contenant du polynaphthalate d'éthylène | [2004/50] |
Former [1999/40] | Elektrophotogaphisches Aufzeichnungselement mit verbesserter Trägerschicht | ||
Former [1999/40] | Electrophotographic imaging member with improved support layer | ||
Former [1999/40] | Elément électrophotographique comprenant une couche support améliorée | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5114818 (YU ROBERT C U [US]) [X] 1,3,5,9,10 * column 6, line 21 - line 49 * * column 10 - column 11; example 1 *; | [X]US5709765 (HERBERT WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,9,10 * column 17, line 13 - line 14 * * column 27 - column 29; example 1 *; | [A]US5167987 (YU ROBERT C U [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 28 * * column 5, line 54 * * column 8, line 19 - line 27 * * column 18; example 1 *; | [A]EP0759581 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 * |