EP0932168 - Coaxial transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70546 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Technology) GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinemann, Lothar, Dr.-Ing. Heddesheimer Strasse 41c 69493 Hirschberg / DE | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James Howrey Simon Arnold & White City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Akers, Noel James Howrey Simon Arnold & White, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [1999/30] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101281.6 | 25.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | DE1998102760 | 26.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19802760 | [1999/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0932168 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0932168 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932168 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
H01F27/2828 (EP);
H01F27/2876 (EP);
H01F2027/2833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/06] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Koaxialtransformator | [1999/30] | English: | Coaxial transformer | [1999/30] | French: | Transformateur coaxial | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3453574 (PARRY THEODORE DE) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 18-47; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5; | [X]US3197723 (DORTORT ISADORE K) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]US4639707 (TANAKA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]DE4318270 (ZIELINSKI ADOLF HERBERT ASTOR [DE]) [A] 4 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]US3717808 (HORNA O) [A] * figures 3A,,7A *; | [A]WO9409544 (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST [US]) |