EP0933695 - IC card equipped with elliptic curve encryption processing facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | ||
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Seiji 59-2-B407, Ontacho-1-chome Higashimurayama-shi / JP | 02 /
Takaragi, Kazuo 14-28-305, Kokubuminami-3-chome Ebina-shi / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/31] | Application number, filing date | 99101414.3 | 26.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19980015376 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1537698 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933695 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933695 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933695 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
G06F7/725 (EP,US);
G06F7/728 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/36] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | IC-Karte ausgerüstet mit einer Verarbeitungsanlage für Elliptische-Kurven-Verschlüsselung | [2005/22] | English: | IC card equipped with elliptic curve encryption processing facility | [1999/31] | French: | Carte à puce équipé d'une installation de traitement pour le chiffrage à courbe elliptique | [1999/31] |
Former [1999/31] | IC-Karte ausgerüstetet mit einer Verarbeitungsanlage für Elliptische-Kurven-Verschlüsselung | Examination procedure | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5463690 (CRANDALL RICHARD E [US]) [Y] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 22 - line 37 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 37 * * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 13 * * column 13, line 11 - column 14, line 17 *; | [A]EP0801345 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] * figure 1 * | [Y] - STRUIF B, "THE USE OF CHIPCARDS FOR ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES AND ENCRYPTION", ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY, SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS. (COMPEURO),US,WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19890508), vol. CONF. 3, pages 4 - 155-158, XP000044202 [Y] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * | [A] - MIYAJI A, "ELLIPTIC CURVES SUITABLE FOR CRYPTOSYSTEMS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO,JP, (1994), vol. E77-A, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 98 - 104, XP000439669 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - SEDLAK H ET AL, "AN RSA CRYPTOGRAPHY PROCESSOR", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BV., AMSTERDAM, (1986), vol. 18, no. 1/05, ISSN 0165-6074, pages 583 - 590, XP000615683 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(86)90094-3 |