EP0945123 - Use of fatty acids as brightening agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kahre, Jörg Dr. Am Treppchen 8 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
Ansmann, Achim, Dr. Kirchberg 25 40699 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
Kawa, Rolf Fontanestrasse 28 40789 Monheim / DE | [1999/39] | Application number, filing date | 99101812.8 | 28.01.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | DE1998105704 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19805704 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945123 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945123 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/361 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/05] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung von Fettsäuren als Avivagemittel | [1999/39] | English: | Use of fatty acids as brightening agents | [1999/39] | French: | Utilisation d'acides gras comme agents d'avivage | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 27.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/30] | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19751589 (GOLDWELL GMBH) [E] 1-8 * page 2, lines 2-16; example 4; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0555690 (CURTIS HELENE IND INC) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 27 - line 30 * * page 3, line 15 - line 34; claim 1 *; | [X]DE3347189 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-6 * page 26, paragraph 4 - page 27, paragraph 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5360581 (RIZVI RIAZ ET AL) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 60 - line 64; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 1-18 *; | [X]EP0115252 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-3 * page 48, paragraph 3 - page 49, paragraph 4 * |