EP0935183 - Information processing device with head mounted display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2010/42] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states SEL SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Shunpei c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
Hirakta, Yoshiharu c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 03 /
Nishi, Takeshi c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 04 /
Kuwabara, Hideaki c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102400.1 | 08.02.1999 | [1999/32] | Priority number, date | JP19980044658 | 09.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4465898 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0935183 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0935183 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0935183 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G09G3/00, G02B27/01, G06F3/16, G02F1/136, H01L29/786 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G02B27/017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/32] | G06F1/16, G09G3/00, G02B27/01, G06F3/16, G02F1/136 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/34] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsgerät mit einer am Kopf angebrachten Anzeigevorrichtung | [1999/32] | English: | Information processing device with head mounted display | [1999/32] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'informations avec dispositif d'affichage porté sur la tête | [1999/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 16.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.10.2010 | [2011/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0499979 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [A] 6,21 * page 6, line 25 - line 28 *; | [YA]EP0686957 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * column 15, line 35 - line 41 * [A] 23; | [XAY]WO9607947 (VIRTUAL I O INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-14,26,27 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 30 * * page 21, line 10 - line 29 * * page 33, line 4 - line 21 * [A] 22 [Y] 8,15,28; | [YA]EP0720338 (IBM [US]) [Y] 15,28 * abstract * * column 12, line 19 - line 38 * * column 13, line 26 - column 14, line 13 * [A] 16; | [DA]US5643826 (OHTANI HISASHI [JP], et al) [DA] 4,5,19,20 * column 7, line 47 - line 62 *; | [X]WO9731477 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 26,27,29; | [A]EP0827337 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 3 * abstract * * column 5, line 36 - column 7, line 32 *; | [A] - KURIYAMA H ET AL, "COMPREHENSIVE STUDY OF LATERAL GRAIN GROWTH IN POLY-SI FILMS BY EXCIMER LASER ANNEALING AND ITS APPLICATION TO THIN FILM TRANSISTORS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19941001), vol. 33, no. 10, PART 01, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 5657 - 5662, XP000596958 [A] 4-6,19-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.33.5657 | [A] - TOSHIRO SHINOHARA ET AL, "HIGH-PERFORMANCE POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON TFTS USING SELF-ALIGNED GRAIN BOUNDARY CONTROL TECHNIQUE", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, (19931001), vol. 76, no. 10, ISSN 8756-663X, pages 99 - 106, XP000438830 [A] 29 * page 106, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [PA] - OHTANI H ET AL, "Continuous-grain silicon makes the HDTV Retro-Projector sizzle", INFORMATION DISPLAY, NOV. 1998, PALISADES INST. RES. SERVICES, USA, vol. 14, no. 11, ISSN 0362-0972, pages 22 - 24, XP002115226 [PA] 4-6,19-21,29 | by applicant | JPH0878329 |