EP0924961 - Electroacoustic transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knowles Electronics, LLC 1151 Maplewood Drive Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | [2002/17] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states KNOWLES ELECTRONICS CO. 73 Victoria Road Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9LP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salvage, Richard James 2 Manor Road Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 0NL / GB | 02 /
Harrington, Steven John Dr. 8 Godstall Lane Steyming, West Sussex BN44 3WE / GB | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99102640.2 | 15.10.1993 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | GB19920022677 | 29.10.1992 Original published format: GB 9222677 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924961 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924961 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04R11/00 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
H04R11/04 (EP);
H04R11/00 (EP);
H04R11/02 (EP);
H04R2205/041 (EP);
H04R25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL [1999/25] | Title | German: | Elektroakustischer Wandler | [1999/25] | English: | Electroacoustic transducer | [1999/25] | French: | Transducteur électroacoustique | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93923007.4 / EP0667093 | EP97103200.8 / EP0784415 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.03.2002 | CH | 13.03.2002 | FR | 13.03.2002 | LI | 13.03.2002 | NL | 13.03.2002 | DK | 13.06.2002 | IE | 15.10.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/02] | BE | 13.03.2002 | |
CH | 13.03.2002 | ||
LI | 13.03.2002 | ||
NL | 13.03.2002 | ||
DK | 13.06.2002 | ||
IE | 15.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | BE | 13.03.2002 | |
CH | 13.03.2002 | ||
LI | 13.03.2002 | ||
NL | 13.03.2002 | ||
DK | 13.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 13.03.2002 | |
CH | 13.03.2002 | ||
LI | 13.03.2002 | ||
NL | 13.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 13.03.2002 | |
LI | 13.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4272654 (CARLSON ELMER V) [DA] 1,2 * column 2, lines 23-45 ** column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 59 *; | [X]GB2085694 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 30-40 * * page 1, lines 72-75 * * figure 1 * |