EP0940706 - Transparent front-surface illuminating apparatus in a liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/36] | Transparent and spread illuminating apparatus | ||
[2004/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Ohaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Minebea Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Ohaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shingo c/o Minebea Co., Ltd. R&D Center 1743-1 Asana, Asabo-cho Iwata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99102645.1 | 12.02.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | JP19980053248 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5324898 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940706 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940706 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
G02B6/0061 (EP,US);
G02F1/133553 (EP,US);
G02F1/133616 (EP,US);
Y10S385/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/20] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Transparente Frontflächenbeleuchtungseinrichtung in einer Flüssigkristallanzeige | [2004/41] | English: | Transparent front-surface illuminating apparatus in a liquid crystal display | [2004/41] | French: | Dispositif transparent d'illumination par la face avant pour un afficheur à cristaux liquides | [2004/41] |
Former [1999/36] | Ausgedehnte und transparente Beleuchtungseinrichtung | ||
Former [1999/36] | Transparent and spread illuminating apparatus | ||
Former [1999/36] | Appareil d'illumination étalé et transparent | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5339179 (RUDISILL CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column W * |