EP0939261 - Laminar-flow flexible metal hose and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Castelli, Sergio Piazza del Monastero, 19 I-10146 Torino / IT | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99102750.9 | 22.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00151 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: IT TO980151 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939261 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939261 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/16, F16L9/16 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
F16L11/16 (EP);
F16L9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/20] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flexibler Metallschlauch mit laminarer Strömung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1999/35] | English: | Laminar-flow flexible metal hose and method for manufacturing the same | [1999/35] | French: | Tuyau flexible métallique à écoulement laminaire et méthode pour sa fabrication | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 02.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/05] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 23.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2645946 (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) [X] 1,9 * claims 1-5 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 2; figures 2-5 * [A] 2,4-7,10-14; | [A]DD64416 (WITTSTOCK, W.) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - DIPL.-ING- JOHANN WROBEL UND DIPL.-ING. FRIEDRICH EITEL, "Gewickelte und gewellte Metallschläuche - Auslegung, Herstellung und Einsatzmöglichkeiten", 3R INTERNATIONAL, Essen, DE, (198707), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 406 - 411, XP002101629 [A] 1,9 * page 408 - page 409, "Gewellte Metallschläuche" : paragraph 2, "Wendelgewellte Metallschläuche" * |