EP0940541 - Hinge for doors, windows or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, GB, GR, LI | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Hahn GmbH & Co. KG Trompeterallee 162-170 D-41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2009/31] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Dr. Hahn GmbH & Co. KG Trompeterallee 162-170 D-41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palmowsky, Hans-Jürgen Sperberweg 36 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, et al Patentanwalt Benrather Schlossallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Benrather Schlossallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | Kluin, Jörg-Eden, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Dres. Fitzner, Münch & Kluin Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/20] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1999/36] | Palgen, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Palgen, Schumacher & Kluin, Mulvanystrasse 2 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102958.8 | 13.02.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | DE19982003885U | 05.03.1998 Original published format: DE 29803885 U | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940541 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940541 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940541 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04, E05D5/06, E05D11/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
E05D5/06 (EP);
E05D7/0423 (EP);
E05D2007/0484 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/36] | E05D7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2004/40] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 29.05.2004 | LV | 29.05.2004 | RO | 29.05.2004 | SI | 29.05.2004 | Title | German: | Band für Türen, Fenster oder dergleichen | [1999/36] | English: | Hinge for doors, windows or the like | [1999/36] | French: | Charnière pour portes, fenêtres ou similaires | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 08.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, IE, LU, MC | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | GB | 13.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/19] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE8624920U (DR. HAHN GMBH & CO) [X] 1 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 *[A] 2,3 | by applicant | - GMBH&CO.MöNCHENGLADBACH, Hahn KT-N Einbauanleitung, DR. HAHN, D-4118 |