EP0945738 - Underwater sensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STN ATLAS Marine Electronics GmbH Behringstrasse 120 22763 Hamburg / DE | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wentzell, Hubertus Joseph-Haydn-Strasse 20 28209 Bremen / DE | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Mahler, Peter Feddersen Laule Ewerwahn Scherzberg Finkelburg Clemm Jungfernstieg 51 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Mahler, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Feddersen Laule Ewerwahn Scherzberg Finkelburg Clemm Jungfernstieg 51 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/44] | Schulz, Klaus, Patentassessor, Dipl.-Ing. c/o STN Atlas Elektronik GmbH, Patentabteilung 28305 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103266.5 | 19.02.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | DE1998113297 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813297 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945738 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945738 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/521, G10K11/00, H04R1/44 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
G01S7/521 (EP);
G01V1/186 (EP);
G01S15/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/39] | G01S7/521 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/02] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Unterwasser-Sensoreinrichtung | [1999/39] | English: | Underwater sensor device | [1999/39] | French: | Dispositif capteur sous-marin | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/34] | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.12.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.12.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19548017 (STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH) [DA] 1-9 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 21; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5109364 (STINER ROY E) [A] 1-9 * column 7 - column 9; figure - *; | [DA]DE3815359 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1-9 * abstract *; | [DA]GB2306848 (SYNTRON INC) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * |