EP0939400 - Optical disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Nobuhiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Minoru c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Akimoto, Yoshihiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takase, Fuminori c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103409.1 | 22.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | JP19980045904 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4590498 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939400 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
G11B7/243 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/257 (KR);
G11B7/258 (EP,US);
G11B7/2585 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/24308 (KR);
G11B2007/2431 (KR);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (KR);
G11B7/00454 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/19] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Platte | [1999/35] | English: | Optical disc | [1999/35] | French: | Disque optique | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0356064 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0574025 (TDK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * Table 1; column 8, lines 25-39; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]US5674649 (YOSHIOKA KAZUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1; claims 1,7-10 *; | [X]EP0822543 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [X] 1-4* figure 1; claim 1 * |