EP0938925 - Composition containing a zeolite-cellulose composite and product made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/35] | Composition containing inorganic porous crystals-hydrophilic macromolecule composite and product made therefrom | ||
[2005/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rengo Co., Ltd. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0007 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Rengo Co., Ltd. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0007 / JP | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Rengo Co., Ltd. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Kouju, c/o Rengo Co., Ltd., Central Lab. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Maki, c/o Rengo Co., Ltd., Central Lab. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | 03 /
Utsunomiya, Takaaki, c/o Rengo Co.Ltd., Central Lab. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | 04 /
Fujimoto, Yoshinobu, c/o Rengo Co.Ltd., Central Lab. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | [2005/25] |
Former [1999/35] | 01 /
Sugiyama, Kouju, c/o Rengo Co., Ltd., Central Lab. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakano, Maki, c/o Rengo Co., Ltd., Central Lab. 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | |||
03 /
Utsunomiya, Takaaki, c/o Rengo Co., Ltd., Central 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | |||
04 /
Fujimoto, Yoshinobu, c/o Rengo Co., Ltd., Central 1-186, Obiraki 4-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0007 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103446.3 | 23.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | JP19980043534 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4353498 | JP19980043539 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4353998 | JP19980043632 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4363298 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938925 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938925 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/24, B01J20/26, B01J20/18, D21H17/68, D21H11/16, B32B19/00, C08K9/08, D01F1/10, C09D5/00 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
D21H11/20 (EP);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
A46D1/00 (EP);
A46D1/006 (EP);
A61L15/18 (EP);
A61L15/28 (EP);
A61L15/32 (EP);
A61L15/40 (EP);
A61L15/46 (EP);
B01J20/18 (EP);
B01J20/24 (EP);
B01J20/26 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B9/02 (EP);
C04B14/047 (EP);
C08K9/08 (EP);
C08L1/00 (EP);
C09D1/00 (EP);
D04H1/4209 (EP);
D06M11/79 (EP);
D21C9/004 (EP);
A61L2300/102 (EP);
A61L2300/404 (EP);
A61L2300/63 (EP);
D21H13/08 (EP);
D21H13/14 (EP);
D21H15/10 (EP);
D21H17/68 (EP);
D21H17/70 (EP);
D21H27/36 (EP);
D21H27/38 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/19] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung, die ein Zeolith-Cellulose-Verbundmaterial enthält, und damit hergestelltes Produkt | [2005/01] | English: | Composition containing a zeolite-cellulose composite and product made therefrom | [2005/01] | French: | Composition contenant un materiau composite zéolithe-cellulose et produit obtenu à partir de celle-ci | [2005/01] |
Former [1999/35] | Anorganische poröse Kristalle und hydrophiles makromolekules Verbundmaterial enthaltende Zusammensetzung und damit hergestelltes Produkt | ||
Former [1999/35] | Composition containing inorganic porous crystals-hydrophilic macromolecule composite and product made therefrom | ||
Former [1999/35] | Composition contenant un materiau composite fabriqué à partir de cristaux inorganiques poreux et de macromolecules hydrophiles et produit obtenu à partir de celle-ci | Examination procedure | 05.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09268500 ; | [X]JPS60181370 ; | [X]JPH02160915 ; | [X]JPH01221242 ; | [A]JPH04122743 ; | [A]JPS54139640 ; | [X]US4775585 (HAGIWARA ZENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-16 * column 4, line 66 - line 67 * * column 8, line 50 - line 61 * * column 9, line 49 - line 68 * * column 10, line 1 - line 16 *; | [A]WO9216291 (ROLLEN JARL ERIK [SE]) [A] * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0826822 (RENGO CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,3-7,9 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 51, Database accession no. 97-554978, XP002103624 & JPH09268500 A 19971014 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10,14,16,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860206), vol. 010, no. 031, Database accession no. (C - 327), & JP60181370 A 19850917 (KANEBO KK) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900912), vol. 014, no. 423, Database accession no. (C - 0757), & JP02160915 A 19900620 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,11,13-16 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 41, Database accession no. 89-297758, XP002103625 & JPH01221242 A 19890904 (DAI NIPPON PRINTING KK) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 23, Database accession no. 92-188655, XP002103626 & JPH04122743 A 19920423 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 49, Database accession no. 79-88508B, XP002103627 & JPS54139640 A 19791030 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-3,8 * abstract * | Examination | US3099570 | EP0457235 | JPH0517124 | JPH05106199 |