EP0940381 - Process for the recovery of cyclopentane and/or cyclopentene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/36] | process for the recovery of cyclopentane and/or cyclopentene | ||
[2003/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Köln GmbH Alte Strasse 201 D-50769 Köln / DE | [2002/18] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states EC ERDÖLCHEMIE GMBH Alte Strasse 201 D-50769 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stüwe, Arnd Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 34 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Wurz, Rolf Dieter, verstorben / DE | 03 /
Müller, Michael, Dr. Ansteler Weg 19 50769 Köln / DE | 04 /
Herwig, Jens, Dr. Nerzweg 2 50859 Köln / DE | 05 /
Gabel, Christian, Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 17 41539 Dormagen / DE | 06 /
Grub, Joachim, Dr. Stettiner Strasse 19 41539 Dormagen / DE | [2003/45] |
Former [1999/36] | 01 /
Stüwe, Arnd Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 34 51373 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02 /
Wurz, Rolf Dieter, deceased / DE | |||
03 /
Müller, Michael, Dr. Ansteler Weg 19 50769 Köln / DE | |||
04 /
Herwig, Jens, Dr. Nerzweg 2 50859 Köln / DE | |||
05 /
Gabel, Christian, Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 17 41539 Dormagen / DE | |||
06 /
Grub, Joachim, Dr. Stettiner Strasse 19 41539 Dormagen / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Preece, Michael, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division Sunbury Research Centre Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [1999/36] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al BAYER AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103516.3 | 24.02.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | DE1998109361 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19809361 | DE1998149425 | 27.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19849425 | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940381 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940381 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940381 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/00, C07C7/04, C07C5/03, C10G45/32, C10G65/06 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C07C13/10 (EP,US);
C07C13/12 (EP,US);
C07C9/18 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/10 (EP,US);
Y10S203/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/36] | C07C7/00, C07C7/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Cyclopentan und/oder Cyclopenten | [1999/36] | English: | Process for the recovery of cyclopentane and/or cyclopentene | [2003/16] | French: | Procédé de récupération de cyclopentane et/ou de cyclopentène | [1999/36] |
Former [1999/36] | process for the recovery of cyclopentane and/or cyclopentene | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 05.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1643947 (ERDOELCHEMIE GMBH) [A] 1,4,5; | [XA]DE2256384 (ERDOELCHEMIE GMBH, et al) [X] 1,4,5 * page 9 - page 10; figure 1; examples 1-3 * * page 9 - page 10; figure 1; examples 1-3 * [A] 2,3; | [AD]EP0799881 (BASF AG [DE])[AD] 1-5 |