EP1031387 - Device to reveal metal fragments in a material flow being driven through a duct pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jossi Holding AG Alte Landstrasse 8546 Islikon / CH | [2000/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Wenger, René, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Wenger, René, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 99103827.4 | 27.02.1999 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031387 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/344, D01B3/02 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B07C5/344 (EP);
D01B3/025 (EP);
D01G31/003 (EP);
B07C2501/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ermitteln von Metallteilen in einem durch eine Rohrleitung geführten Materialstrom | [2000/35] | English: | Device to reveal metal fragments in a material flow being driven through a duct pipe | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif pour dépister des fragments de métal dans un flux de matériau passant dans une conduite | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 01.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/30] | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3924566 (HAMOS ELEKTRONIK) [X] 1,6-10 * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 26 *; | [X]US4171262 (LATTMANN WERNER ET AL) [X] 1,10 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 47 *; | [X]US4480753 (THOMAS JOE P ET AL) [X] 1,10 * column 3, line 28 - line 59 *; | [A]DE2624819 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 2-5 * page 2, paragraph 5 *; | [DA]DE4322345 (JOSSI HANS PRAEZISIONSMECHANIK) |