EP0957181 - Alloy steel for sliding surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stahlwerk Ergste Westig GmbH Letmather Strasse 69 58239 Schwerte / DE | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osing, Heinz-Jürgen Goeresstrasse 23 58636 Iserlohn / DE | 02 /
Kloss-Ulitzka, Gisbert Hinter der Stadt 26 58809 Neuenrade / DE | 03 /
Rittinghaus, Klaus-Peter Kühlingstrasse 26 58642 Iserlohne / DE | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | König, Reimar, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | König, Reimar, et al König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | König, Reimar, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen, Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 40219 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103843.1 | 27.02.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | DE1998108276 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19808276 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957181 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957181 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/22, C22C38/00, A63C5/048 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C21D1/25 (EP,US);
C21D9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stahllegierung für Gleitelemente | [1999/46] | English: | Alloy steel for sliding surfaces | [1999/46] | French: | Acier allié pour surfaces de glissement | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04350118 ; | [A]JPH04354856 ; | [A]CH369481 (BIRMINGHAM SMALL ARMS CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US3139337 (BOYLE CLARENCE J, et al) [X] 1; | [X]DE1238676 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4294613 (GIFLO HENRIK) [X] 1,2 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930422), vol. 17, no. 205, Database accession no. (C - 1051), & JP04350118 A 19921204 (NIPPON STEEL CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930428), vol. 17, no. 216, Database accession no. (C - 1053), & JP04354856 A 19921209 (NIPPON STEEL CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * |