EP0990615 - Elevator with governor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Hirotada, Intellectual Property Division K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 102-8001 / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103919.9 | 05.03.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | JP19980249872 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: JP 24987298 | [2000/45] |
Former [2000/14] | JP19980249872 | 03.10.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990615 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0990615 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990615 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/04 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
B66B5/044 (EP,US);
B66B1/00 (KR);
B66B1/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FI, LI [2001/04] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufzug mit Geschwindigkeitsbegrenzung | [2000/14] | English: | Elevator with governor | [2000/14] | French: | Ascenseur pourvu d'un régulateur de vitesse | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9840304 (KONE OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10 * page 4, line 19 - line 24; figure 4 * [A] 3,6,9; | [A]US5513723 (LUEBKE ROGER D [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 7 - line 11; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US3695399 (LAING MARVIN R) [A] 7 * column 6, line 40 - line 41; figure 3 * |